FL H0485 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises amounts authorized to be paid as allowance for members of authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Santa Rosa Island Authority, Escambia County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#360 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-183
2015-06-10 Approved by Governor
2015-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-29SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2015-04-27SenateReceived
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 04/29/15
2015-04-27SenateReferred to Rules
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HousePassed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 2
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-24HouseAmendment(s) adopted (955887)
2015-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
2015-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-05HouseFavorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-03-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/05/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-18HouseNow in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-02-17HouseFavorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 02/17/15, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-01-21HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback