FL H0483 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 612 (Ch. 2023-192)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 612 (Ch. 2023-192)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Secretary of Health Care Administration, in conjunction with State Surgeon General, to establish blood clot & pulmonary embolism policy workgroup; provides for duties, membership, terms of office, & meetings of workgroup; requires Secretary of Health Care Administration to submit annual reports, & final report by specified date, to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Blood Clot and Pulmonary Embolism Policy Workgroup
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 612 (Ch. 2023-192) |
2023-03-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-24 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2023-03-17 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-10 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-10 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-10 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-07 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S612 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Chapter No. 2023-192