FL H0483 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Commission on Capital Cases; provides for membership, terms, meeting procedures, per diem & travel expenses, staff support, & duties; provides for assumption of certain duties of Justice Administrative Commission by Commission on Capital Cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on Capital Cases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
277002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27716Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback