FL H0481 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-6)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-6)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to provide sufficient funding to NASA & John F. Kennedy Space Center to mitigate severe economic impact that will result in Florida when nation's human space flight program ceases operations & before new human space flight program begins.
Title
NASA & John F. Kennedy Space Center Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-21 | In Messages | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00816; CS adopted -HJ 00816 | |
2010-04-16 | -HJ 00729; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Original reference(s) removed: Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council; Referred to- Calendar -HJ 00732 | |
2010-04-16 | CS by Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00732; CS read 1st time on | |
2010-04-15 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council -HJ 00046 | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council | |
2009-12-10 | Filed |