FL H0477 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirement relating to background screening of instructional personnel in virtual instruction programs; provides additional offenses that determine ineligibility for educator certification or employment; revises requirements for submission, retention, search, & reporting of fingerprints of educational personnel & contractual personnel; provides for FDLE participation in national retained print arrest notification program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Background Screening

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar
2015-03-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-30HouseCS by Education Committee read 1st time
2015-03-30HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-26HouseCS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2015-03-20HouseNow in Education Committee
2015-03-19HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
2015-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/19/15, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2015-03-04HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2015-03-04HouseFavorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-03-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2015-01-28HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee
2015-01-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0970 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012467Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012795Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012796Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012797Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback