FL H0473 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes excise tax on bottled water operators; specifies tax rate & trust fund for tax proceeds; requires tax proceeds to be used for certain purposes; specifies procedures for bottled water operators related to tax payments; authorizes DOR to settle or compromise taxes; provides recordkeeping requirements for bottled water operators; specifies DOR's authority to inspect books, records, & papers, issue subpoenas, & apply for certain judicial orders; provides procedures for DOR in conducting audits; specifies procedures for claiming refunds; provides that taxes due remain lien on certain property; requires that suits brought by DOR for violations be brought in circuit court; provides criminal penalties.
Title
Bottled Water Excise Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Ways & Means Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-11-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S798 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
211 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/473 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/473/BillText/Filed/PDF |