FL H0471 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes use of specified portion of additional court cost for county juvenile electronic & GPS monitoring programs; provides that child who commits direct contempt of court or indirect contempt of valid court order may be placed on home detention with or without electronic or GPS monitoring; provides that at any time after child has been arrested for allegedly committing delinquent act & any time during pendency of case, child may be placed under restrictions by court, including electronic or GPS monitoring; authorizes court, upon motion of child or upon its own motion, within specified period, to suspend further execution of disposition & place child in probation program & require electronic or GPS monitoring; authorizes use of electronic or GPS monitoring program to enforce specified restrictions on certain juvenile sexual offenders in community-based treatment alternatives.
Title
Monitoring Juvenile Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 47 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 47 | |
2011-10-25 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
939 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/471 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0471/BillText/Filed/HTML |