FL H0467 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revising the powers and duties of the Board of Physical Therapy Practice; requiring the board to establish minimum standards of practice for the performance of dry needling, and additional supervision and training requirements for the performance of dry needling of specified areas, by physical therapists, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical Therapy Practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#590 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Chapter No. 2020-128
2020-06-29 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-10HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-10SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
2020-03-10SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 792
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (721931)
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-20HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-20HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-18HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-02-11HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-11HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-21HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-07HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S792 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 467

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
486021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback