FL H0467 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires rental agreement to specify whether renters insurance is required; specifies provisions that must be included in rental agreement if insurance is or is not required; provides that failure to include certain notice in rental agreement does not create private cause of action or nullify any part of rental agreement.
Title
Renters Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S678 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/467 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/467/BillText/Filed/PDF |