FL H0463 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions to include digital platforms; revises certain presale disclosure requirements; revises provisions relating to prohibitions on bypassing portions of ticket buying process, disguising identity of buyer, or circumventing security measures; provides criminal penalties for knowingly reselling ticket in violation of statute; requires ticket brokers to make specified disclosures before resale of ticket; provides indemnity for resale websites and online marketplaces from the representations of resellers; prohibits misrepresentations of affiliation or endorsement by resellers without consent; provides exceptions; authorizes DACS to enforce ticket resale provisions; deletes provisions imposing penalties for intentionally using or selling software to circumvent certain ticket seller security measures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ticket Sales

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar
2015-04-17HouseCS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-16HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-14HouseCS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-04-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/14/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-04-07HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-04-07HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
2015-04-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/07/15, 4:30 pm, Reed Hall
2015-03-27HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-26HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-24HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-01-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0742 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
81736Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/463
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/Amendment/818903/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/Amendment/393821/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/Amendment/194277/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/Amendment/898291/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/Amendment/691613/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/Amendment/407063/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/Amendment/265763/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0463/Amendment/342053/PDF

Bill Comments

feedback