FL H0459 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises circumstances under which step-therapy protocols may not be required; requires health insurers & HMOs to publish on their websites & provide to their insureds & subscribers specified information; provides requirements for procedures for requests & appeals of denials of protocol exemptions; provides requirements for authorizations & denials of protocol exemption requests; authorizes health insurers & HMOs to request specified documentation.
Title
Step-therapy Protocols
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#622 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#622 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Chapter No. 2022-47 | |
2022-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for SB 730 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-25 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022) |
2022-01-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-24 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-02 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-12-02 | House | Favorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S730 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 459
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 42393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |