FL H0457 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that certain individuals may not be denied classification as residents for purposes of receiving state financial aid awards based on his or her immigration status if certain criteria are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Eligibility Requirements for State Financial Aid Awards and Tuition Assistance Grants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1234 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100940Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback