FL H0457 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 520 (Ch. 2014-78)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 520 (Ch. 2014-78)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for information contained in dental workforce surveys submitted by dentists or dental hygienists to DOH; provides exceptions to exemption; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Dental Workforce Surveys
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 520 (Ch. 2014-78) |
2014-04-28 | House | Substituted SB 520 |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/14, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-25 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/25/14, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/18/14, 9:00 am, 306 HOB |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-12-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0520 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-78
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/457 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0457/BillText/Filed/PDF |