FL H0457 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Revises legislative findings relating to implementation of Model Ordinance for Florida-Friendly Fertilizer Use on Urban Landscapes; updates reference to version of model ordinance; revises authority of county & municipal governments to adopt fertilizer standards that are in addition to or more stringent than standards of model ordinance; requires county & municipal governments to report adoption of such standards to DEP; provides for applicability of specified provisions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fertilizer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#219 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-20 In Messages
2011-04-15 Read 3rd time -HJ 653
2011-04-14 Read 2nd time -HJ 633
2011-04-11 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/11
2011-04-10 Placed on Calendar -HJ 610
2011-04-08 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-07 CS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3 -HJ 601
2011-04-05 On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2011-03-29 Original reference(s) removed: Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee
2011-03-28 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-23 CS/CS by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 7 -HJ 340
2011-03-21 On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 44
2011-03-03 Now in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee -HJ 149
2011-02-28 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-02-22 CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 3 -HJ 152
2011-02-15 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 02/22/11, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2011-02-07 Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 44
2011-01-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0606 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4039336Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4039337Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
576181Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback