FL H0455 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education & Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements for specified school district strategic plan & annual DOE review of K-12 & postsecondary career & technical education offerings; & requires school districts to inform students & parents of specified information during middle school course selection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career-themed Courses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseDied in Education & Employment Committee
2023-03-23HouseNow in Education & Employment Committee
2023-03-23HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2023-03-23HouseOriginal reference removed: Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
2023-03-22House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-03-22HouseCS Filed
2023-03-22HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-22HouseReported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
2023-03-21HouseFavorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
2023-03-17HousePCS added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-02-01HouseNow in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
2023-02-01HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2023-02-01HouseReferred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
2023-02-01HouseReferred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
2023-01-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1468 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Pre-K -12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003492Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034935Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback