FL H0453 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises elements of a plan required for school district funding under mental health assistance allocation.
Title
Student Mental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S850 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/453 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/453/BillText/Filed/PDF |