FL H0453 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes county or municipality to regulate operation of micromobility devices; authorizes county or municipality to require licensure; requires proof of certain insurance coverage; provides that regulation of micromobility devices is controlled by state & federal law; provides that operator has all rights & duties applicable to rider of bicycle; exempts micromobility device from certain requirements; provides that person is not required to have valid driver license to operate micromobility device; authorizes parking on sidewalk; requires securing of shared micromobility devices under certain circumstances; exempts micromobility devices from certain emblem requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Micromobility Devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#255 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18 Chapter No. 2019-109
2019-06-18 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 32 NAYS 1
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 542
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (321941)
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time 890
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-10HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 1
2019-04-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-28HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-06HouseNow in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S542 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 453 (Ch. 2019-109)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
150Amended CodeSee Bill Text
175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1150Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1350Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1450Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1575Amended CodeSee Bill Text
250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
350Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3250Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200863Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3220255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
450Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655961Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8775Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback