FL H0445 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides limitation on certain fees charged by airports or seaports; prohibits certain airports & seaports from removing, degrading, or impeding access to certain services, benefits, or infrastructure.
Title
Transportation Network Companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-01 | House | PCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S696 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/445 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/445/BillText/Filed/PDF |