FL H0445 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 662 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises student enrollment preferences relating to certain military transfers; & revises calculation of school grades by specified date to include students who earned specified score on Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery (ASVAB).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Service Educational Opportunities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 662 passed
2020-02-17HouseCS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2020-02-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-14HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-12HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in Education Committee
2020-02-06HouseCS referred to Education Committee
2020-02-06HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-05HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-30HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-10-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S662 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-75
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback