FL H0445 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes creation of s. 8, Art. VI of State Constitution to guarantee the right to vote by absentee ballot or early voting within 30 days before general election.
Title
Voter Access Guarantee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Ethics and Elections Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/445 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0445/BillText/Filed/PDF |