FL H0443 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urges President to support establishment of US Space Force & US Space Command in Florida.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Space Command and United States Space Force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-26SenateReceived
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Rules
2020-02-19SenateIn Messages
2020-02-19HouseCS adopted
2020-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-30HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-14HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-12HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-12-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-12-11HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-12-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-10-30HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-10-23HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback