FL H0435 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises prohibition on sexual activities with animals; increases criminal penalties for such activities; requires orders to prohibit persons convicted of such activities from ownership of animals & other conduct related to animals.
Title
Animal Abuse
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Michael Grieco [D] | Rep. Linda Chaney [R] |
Rep. Daisy Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-02 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S420 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1341 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S1806 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1798 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Ordered enrolled
H1341 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S1806 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1798 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Ordered enrolled
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
828 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |