FL H0431 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-241

Summary

Abolishes district; provides for transfer of district assets & indebtedness; repeals special acts relating to district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace Creek Drainage District, Polk County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-241
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01284
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00943; Read 3rd time -SJ 00943; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00943
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00866; Referred to Rules -SJ 00866
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00904; Read 3rd time -HJ 00904; Passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 -HJ 00904
2010-03-10 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00268; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00268
2010-03-08 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/10/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-05 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00222
2010-03-04 Favorable by Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00222
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00042; On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/03/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall; Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00167; Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC) -HJ 00167; On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 02/17/10, 2:45 pm, Reed Hall; Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -HJ 00169; Now in Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00169; On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC), 03/04/10, 8:30 am, 306-H
2010-02-17 Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 8 NAYS 0; Now in Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC)
2010-02-10 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 02/17/10, 2:45 pm, Reed Hall
2010-02-03 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0; Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC)
2010-01-27 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/03/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2009-12-18 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-12-04 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1212 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 431 (Ch. 2010-241)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback