FL H0427 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates Honor & Remember flag as state emblem; authorizes display of flag at specified locations, on specified days, & in specified manner; requires flags to be manufactured in U.S.; provides for adoption of certain regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor and Remember Flag

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#181 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chapter No. 2019-145
2019-06-26 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-30HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-30SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 718
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-10HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2019-04-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-07HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-06HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-15HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S718 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 427 (Ch. 2019-145)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25616Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback