FL H0425 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for "Florida Bill of Rights for Children with Disabilities & their Parents or Guardians"; provides guarantees relating to free appropriate public education, least-restrictive educational environment, IEPs, procedural due process, nondiscriminatory assessment, parental participation, & data sharing.
Title
Education of Children with Disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in K-12 Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/425 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0425/BillText/Filed/PDF |