FL H0417 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying and location information of current or former directors, managers, supervisors, and clinical employees of child advocacy centers that meet certain standards and requirements, members of a child protection team, and the spouses and children thereof; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Child Advocacy Center Personnel and Child Protection Team Members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#886 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#629 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-147
2018-04-06 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-08HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 1111
2018-03-08HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (931918)
2018-03-07HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-07SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateAmendment(s) adopted (931918)
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1212
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseAmendment(s) adopted (056567)
2018-02-14HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-25HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/25/18, 11:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-12HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-11HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-10HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-10HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-12-06HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 8:30 am, Mashburn Hall
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-10-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 417

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/Amendment/214501/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/Amendment/056567/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/Vote/HouseVote_h00417c1629.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/Vote/SenateVote_h00417e1020.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/417/Vote/HouseVote_h00417e1886.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback