FL H0409 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain health care practitioners from specified licensing requirements when providing certain services to veterans in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Licensing Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-30HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/30/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-15HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-11-13HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-11-13HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-11-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 11/13/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-10-30HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S780 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4560231Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback