FL H0403 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates program within AHCA; authorizes agency, in consultation with DVA, to negotiate with federal agencies in order to seek federal funding for program; provides for voluntary enrollment by eligible participants; prohibits certain use of state funds; prohibits program implementation without legislative approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Veterans Care Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Innovation Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-10-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S440 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29217Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback