FL H0399 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-86
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires applications for motor vehicle registrations & applications for driver's licenses to include language permitting applicants to make voluntary contributions to Blind Babies & Blind Youth Services, to Senior Vision Services, for services for persons with developmental disabilities, or to Ronald McDonald House; provides for distribution of funds collected from voluntary contributions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0011 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0612 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-14 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-86
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-21 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00841
2010-04-16 Read 3rd time -SJ 00625; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00625
2010-04-15 Withdrawn from Transportation; Education Pre-K - 12 -SJ 00593; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1138 -SJ 00593; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593
2010-04-14 Received -SJ 00576; Referred to Transportation; Education Pre-K - 12 -SJ 00576
2010-03-24 In Messages
2010-03-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00366; CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 00366
2010-03-18 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00332
2010-03-08 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00225
2010-03-05 CS read 1st time on 03/05/10 -HJ 00220; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-03-03 CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00222
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00039; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H; CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00166; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00159; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Finance & Tax Council -HJ 00163; On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 02/17/10, 1:30 pm, 404-H; Favorable by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00170; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00170; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-01 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-02-18 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-02-17 Favorable by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2010-02-10 On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 02/17/10, 1:30 pm, 404-H
2010-01-27 Now in Finance & Tax Council
2010-01-22 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-01-13 CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2010-01-06 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2009-12-18 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-11-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1138 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/CS/HB 399 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 399 (Ch. 2010-86) -SJ 00593
S2652 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 399 (Ch. 2010-86)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
032002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032218Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0399&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb039900.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb039901c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb039902c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB03990323100612.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB03990416100011.html

Bill Comments

feedback