FL H0397 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Apollo's Law"; requires that firearm sold or transferred in this state by licensed firearms dealer or manufactured in this state include or be accompanied by firearm safety device meeting specified requirements; provides exceptions for firearms purchaser who owns gun safe that meets specified requirements or who shows proof of purchase of approved safety device meeting certain requirements or presents such device; requires DACS to adopt rules for firearm safety devices & gun safes; requires that long-gun safe commercially sold or transferred in this state, or manufactured in this state for sale in this state, that does not meet standards for gun safes be accompanied by specified warning label.
Title
Firearm Safety Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-12-11 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/397 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0397/BillText/Filed/PDF |