FL H0395 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Now in Education & Employment Committee
Pending: House Education & Employment Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Governor to proclaim November 7 of each year as "Victims of Communism Day"; requires day to be observed in public schools & by public exercise; requires certain high school students to receive specified instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims of Communism Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-27 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-27HouseNow in Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-27HouseReported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-27HouseFavorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-25HouseAdded to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-13HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseReported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseFavorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-11HouseAdded to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-05HouseNow in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
2021-10-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S268 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
683334Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback