FL H0393 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits landlord from evicting tenant or terminating rental agreement because tenant or tenant's minor child is victim of actual or threatened domestic violence, dating violence, sexual violence, or stalking; specifies that rental agreement may not contain certain provisions; authorizes victim of such actual or threatened violence or stalking to terminate rental agreement; requires certain documentation & written notice to landlord; provides for liability for rent; specifies that tenant does not forfeit certain money paid to landlord for terminating rental agreement; requires landlord to change locks of dwelling unit within specified period; authorizes tenant to change locks of dwelling unit; prohibits certain actions by landlord.
Title
Early Termination of Rental Agreement by a Crime Victim
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1102 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/393 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/393/BillText/Filed/PDF |