FL H0393 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises circumstances under which person is disqualified from receiving compensation under Victims of Wrongful Incarceration Compensation Act.
Title
Compensation of Victims of Wrongful Incarceration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120) |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted CS/SB 494 |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-28 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/24/17, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-04-17 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-29 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0494 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-120
S0556 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
S0556 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/393 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0393/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/393/BillText/c1/PDF |