FL H0391 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each school district to implement drug & violence prevention program; provides purpose of program; provides program requirements & funding; authorizes SBE to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug and Violence Prevention Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-08HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-12-08HouseWithdrawn from PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-11-01HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-10-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S802 (Same As) 2017-12-11 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006149Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback