FL H0389 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendment to s. 19, Art. III of State Constitution, relating to state trust funds, to require two-thirds vote of membership of each house of Legislature in separate bill for that purpose only to expend balance of state trust fund, or any portion of state trust fund, for any purpose other than purpose authorized by act that created trust fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Trust Funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Finance & Tax Council; Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00038
2009-12-18 Referred to Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Finance & Tax Council; Rules and Calendar Council
2009-11-20 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0952 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00319Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback