FL H0381 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requests U.S. Congress to urge regime of President Maduro to allow delivery of humanitarian assistance, to continue & intensify financial sanctions against Venezuela, & to instruct appropriate Federal agencies to hold Venezuela accountable for law & humanitarian violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Venezuela

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-20SenateReceived
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2018-02-14SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HouseCS adopted
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time 586
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-26HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-24HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1382 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback