FL H0379 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 1:00 pm House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies what constitutes crime of lewd or lascivious molestation upon person 16 years of age or older.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lewd or Lascivious Molestation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HousePCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-11-05HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-10-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S444 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
S878 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback