FL H0379 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds 911 public safety telecommunicators to class; requires such members to have retirement benefits calculated in accordance with provisions for Regular Class members; specifies required employer retirement contribution rates for new membership subclass of 911 public safety telecommunicators; declares that act fulfills important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Risk Class of the Florida Retirement System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S606 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1210515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12171Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback