FL H0377 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits DOC or local governmental body from subjecting youth prisoners to solitary confinement; limits cell confinement; prohibits youth prisoners from being subjected to emergency cell confinement for longer than certain duration; requires facility staff to document placements of youth prisoners in emergency cell confinement; requires mental health clinician perform face-to-face evaluation of youth prisoners subjected to emergency cell confinement; provides for individualized suicide crisis intervention plan for certain youth prisoner; provides for protection of youth prisoners held in disciplinary cell confinement; requires DOC & boards of county commissioners to certify compliance & adopt specified policies & procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth in Solitary Confinement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-08HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-01-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S570 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
S550 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944279Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
958155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback