FL H0377 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides requirements for sales taxes & surcharges on motor vehicle leases & rentals by motor vehicle rental companies & peer-to-peer car-sharing programs; specifies insurance requirements for shared vehicle owners & shared vehicle drivers; provides for liability; provides exceptions; provides for exclusions; provides right of contribution to shared vehicle owner's insurer for certain claims; requires provision of certain information regarding liens; specifies recordkeeping, record-sharing, disclosure, & driver license verification & data retention requirements; provides for consumer protections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Rentals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Commerce Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-12HouseCS/CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
2020-02-12HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2020-02-12HouseCS referred to Commerce Committee
2020-02-12HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: State Affairs Committee
2020-02-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-11HouseCS/CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/11/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2020-02-06HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-23HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S478 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H723 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277483Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback