FL H0371 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional hiring requirements, employment qualifications, & terms of employment for inspectors general & staff; establishes duty of specified persons & entities with respect to inspector general's duties; requires contracts & other specified documents to contain certain statement regarding inspector general's duties; authorizes Chief Inspector General to retain legal counsel & issue & enforce subpoenas.
Title
Agency Inspectors General
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Appropriations Committee | House Government Operations Subcommittee | Rep. Daniel Raulerson [R] |
Rep. Jake Raburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#159 (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#159 (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Chapter No. 2015-173 | |
2015-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1304 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-16 | House | CS passed; YEAS 97 NAYS 17 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | CS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-09 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-08 | House | CS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4 |
2015-04-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-04-06 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2015-04-03 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-03 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-31 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 5 |
2015-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/31/15, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-26 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-24 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1304 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 371 (Ch. 2015-173)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |