FL H0369 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Dental Student Loan Repayment Program to support dentists who practice in public health programs in underserved areas; requires DOH to establish program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental Student Loan Repayment Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-26HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-24HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-10-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S764 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3814019Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback