FL H0363 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act "Hemp Industry Development Act"; provides that hemp is agricultural crop; requires registration of hemp producers; provides exemptions; requires rulemaking; provides for affirmative defense to certain charges relating to cannabis; provides exceptions to other laws.
Title
Hemp Production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0902 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/363 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0363/BillText/Filed/PDF |