FL H0361 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grants certain leasehold interests & improvements to land owned by U.S. or agency thereof, branch of U.S. Armed Forces, or quasi-governmental agency exemption from ad valorem taxation; exempts such leasehold interests & improvements without need to apply for exemption or property appraiser approving exemption; provides nonapplicability & retroactive applicability.
Title
Military Housing Ad Valorem Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#99 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#99 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Chapter No. 2015-80 | |
2015-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-27 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 686 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (242515) |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-20 | House | CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-19 | House | CS/CS by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/19/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-04 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Favorable by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-03 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2015-02-18 | House | Now in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee |
2015-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-02-12 | House | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 02/12/15, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0686 (Same As) 2015-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 361 (Ch. 2015-80)