FL H0359 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Chapter No. 2018-125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires SBA to divest certain investments & prohibits investments in specified institutions doing business with Venezuela, in violation of federal law; prohibits SBA from voting in favor of proxy resolution advocating expanded U.S. trade with such government; prohibits state agencies from investing in specified entities extending credit, buying, or trading goods or services with Venezuela; authorizes Governor to waive investment prohibitions if certain conditions exist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Investments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#527 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Chapter No. 2018-125
2018-03-28 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for SB 538
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-02-01SenateReceived
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateIn Messages
2018-01-25HousePassed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 421
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-11HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/11/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-05HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-05HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-11-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 12/05/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-11-16HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2017-11-16HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 11/16/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H279 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S70 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S538 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 359

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215471Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215472Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback