FL H0357 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defines term "admissions staff"; requires Commission for Independent Education to cause to be investigated criminal justice information for admissions staff; requires investigation for licensure renewal; requires commission to establish standards for admissions staff; provides restriction on solicitation of prospective students for enrollment; requires commission to refuse to grant or renew or to revoke institutional license for crimes relating to fraudulent practices or unfair consumer practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Independent Postsecondary Educational Institutions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 35
2011-02-07 Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 36
2011-01-24 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1264 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100538Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7441083Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback