FL H0353 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides applicability; exempts autonomous vehicles & operators from certain prohibitions; provides that human operator is not required to operate fully autonomous vehicle; authorizes fully autonomous vehicle to operate regardless of presence of human operator; provides that automated driving system is deemed operator of autonomous vehicle operating in autonomous mode; authorizes Florida Turnpike Enterprise to fund & operate test facilities; preempts regulation to state; revises registration requirements for autonomous vehicles; provides insurance requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Government Accountability Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-26HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-22HouseCS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-01-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/22/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-08HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2017-11-08HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-11-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S712 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31685Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33964Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33983Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270653Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627748Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback