FL H0351 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for subcontractor who is not certified or registered to perform construction work under supervision of person who is certified or registered.
Title
Construction Contracting Qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S674 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/351 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/351/BillText/Filed/PDF |