FL H0351 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-91
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires pharmacists to inform customers of certain generically equivalent drug products & whether cost-sharing obligations to such customers exceed retail price of prescription; requires registration with OIR; provides registration requirements; requires registrant to report certain changes by specified date; requires office to issue registration certificate upon receipt of completed registration form; provides for expiration; requires rulemaking; requires certain terms in health insurer or health maintenance organization contracts with pharmacy benefit managers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Pricing Transparency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#702 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-91
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time 894
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1494
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-19HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2018-02-19HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-15HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/15/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-07HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-06HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0
2018-02-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/06/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-26HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1494 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 351

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650244Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651862Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651863Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651864Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651865Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651866Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651867Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651868Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651869Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624490Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276572Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641314Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback