FL H0351 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-168
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Catch Me, Release Me license plate, Florida Horse Park license plate, & Florida Biodiversity Foundation license plate; establishes annual use fee for plates; provides for distribution of use fees received from sale of such plates; revises portion of use fees collected from sale of Florida Salutes Veterans license plate that shall be distributed to direct-support organization, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0022 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0611 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-168
2010-05-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-30 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01693
2010-04-30 Read 3rd time -SJ 01171; CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 2 -SJ 01171
2010-04-29 Withdrawn from Transportation; General Government Appropriations -SJ 01001; Substituted for CS/SB 736 -SJ 01001; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001
2010-04-27 Received -SJ 00921; Referred to Transportation; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00921
2010-03-24 In Messages
2010-03-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00366; CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 00366
2010-03-18 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00330; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00331; Amendment(s) failed -HJ 00331
2010-03-08 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00225
2010-03-05 CS read 1st time on 03/05/10 -HJ 00220; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-03-03 CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00222
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00036; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H; CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -HJ 00166; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00158; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00163; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-01 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-01-27 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-01-22 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-01-13 CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2010-01-06 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2009-12-10 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-11-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0736 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001; Substituted CS/CS/HB 351 -SJ 01001; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168) -SJ 01001
S1522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S1208 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
032008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0351&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb035100.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb035101c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb035102c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb035103e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB03510323100611.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB03510430100022.html

Bill Comments

feedback